There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Saint Francis Dam Disaster National Memorial Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Saint Francis Dam Disaster National Memorial Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Saint Francis Dam Disaster National Memorial Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the establishment of a national memorial and national monument to commemorate those killed by the collapse of the Saint Francis Dam on March 12, 1928, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/05/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4255-4256)
07/01/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-650.
05/16/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
07/06/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/05/2016-8:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/05/2016-8:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4255-4256)
07/05/2016-8:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5244.
07/05/2016-8:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4255-4257)
07/05/2016-8:42pmHouseMrs. Lummis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/01/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 502.
07/01/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-650.
06/15/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
06/15/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/14/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/14/2016HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
05/24/2016HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
05/18/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/16/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/16/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/16/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/16/2016 Referred to
06/15/2016 Markup by
07/01/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-650
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands05/18/2016 Referred to
05/24/2016 Hearings by
06/14/2016 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/06/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5244. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/05/2016)

Saint Francis Dam Disaster National Memorial Act

(Sec. 3) This bill authorizes the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to establish the Saint Francis Dam Disaster National Memorial at the Dam site in Los Angeles County, California, to honor the victims of the Saint Francis Dam disaster of March 12, 1928. The Memorial shall be managed by the Forest Service.

(Sec. 4) USDA shall submit to Congress, by three years after this bill's enactment, recommendations regarding:

  • the planning, design, construction, and long-term management of the Memorial;
  • the proposed boundaries;
  • a visitor center and educational facilities; and
  • ensuring public access to the Memorial.

(Sec. 5) The bill establishes the Saint Francis Dam Disaster National Monument on specified National Forest System land administered by USDA in Los Angeles County for the purpose of conserving and enhancing the cultural, archaeological, historical, watershed, educational, and recreational resources and values of the Monument.

(Sec. 6) USDA shall develop a management plan for the Monument by four years after this bill's enactment. USDA shall manage the Monument: (1) in a manner that conserves and enhances its cultural and historic resources, and (2) in accordance with the Forest and Rangeland Renewable Resources Planning Act of 1974. The bill limits the use of motorized vehicles but permits grazing within the Monument.

(Sec. 7) No additional funds are authorized to carry out this bill's requirements.