There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

LGBT Data Inclusion Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve Federal population surveys by requiring the collection of voluntary, self-disclosed information on sexual orientation and gender identity in certain surveys, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/27/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/27/2016Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/27/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (103)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/27/2016
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/27/2016
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 05/27/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 05/27/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/27/2016
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/07/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/07/2016
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/07/2016
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/07/2016
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/07/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/07/2016
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 06/07/2016
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/07/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/09/2016
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/09/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/09/2016
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/09/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/14/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/14/2016
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/14/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/14/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 07/01/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/01/2016
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/08/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/13/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/08/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/08/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/08/2016
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/08/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/08/2016
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/08/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/21/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 09/28/2016
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/15/2016
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/15/2016
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/15/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/15/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/17/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 11/17/2016
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/30/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform05/27/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5373. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/27/2016)

LGBT Data Inclusion Act

This bill requires federal agencies that collect information through a survey that includes demographic data (where subjects self-report information or a proxy provides information about the subject or responds for all persons in a household) to establish data standards that require:

  • a determination of which existing data sets exclude information about sexual orientation and gender identity;
  • an identification, and a use, of appropriate methods to include questions on sexual orientation and gender identity in surveys that facilitate categorization and voluntary participation and that preserve privacy and confidentiality; and
  • a routine assessment of needed changes in survey methods related to asking such questions.

Agencies that publish reports relying on survey demographic data must include information on sexual orientation and gender identity.

Individuals shall not be: (1) required by this bill to disclose their sexual orientation or gender identity to an agency; or (2) subjected to fines or penalties for refusing to answer, or providing a false answer to, any survey question regarding gender identity or sexual orientation.

Nothing in this bill shall be construed to permit the use of such collected information in a manner that would adversely affect an individual.