There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

No Veterans Crisis Line Call Should Go Unanswered Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

No Veterans Crisis Line Call Should Go Unanswered Act

Short Titles as Introduced

No Veterans Crisis Line Call Should Go Unanswered Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

No Veterans Crisis Line Call Should Go Unanswered Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to improve the Veterans Crisis Line.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
11/28/2016Became Public Law No: 114-247. (TXT | PDF)
11/28/2016Signed by President.
11/18/2016Presented to President.
11/16/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6421)
09/26/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 357 - 0 (Roll no. 558).(text: CR H5888)
06/07/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/28/2016Became Public Law No: 114-247. (TXT | PDF)
11/28/2016Signed by President.
11/18/2016HousePresented to President.
11/17/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/16/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6421)
09/27/2016SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/26/2016-7:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2016-7:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 357 - 0 (Roll no. 558). (text: CR H5888)
09/26/2016-6:53pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5893-5894)
09/26/2016-4:28pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/26/2016-4:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5392.
09/26/2016-4:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5888-5891)
09/26/2016-4:04pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/21/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/21/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/13/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/07/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/07/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs06/07/2016 Referred to
09/21/2016 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health06/13/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5392. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-247 (11/28/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

No Veterans Crisis Line Call Should Go Unanswered Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to develop a quality assurance document for carrying out the toll-free Veterans Crisis Line (VCL), which shall: (1) outline performance indicators and objectives to improve the VCL, including at backup call centers; (2) include time frames to meet such indicators and objectives; and (3) be consistent with guidance issued by the Office of Management and Budget.

The VA shall develop a plan to ensure that each telephone call, text message, and other communications received by the VCL, including at backup call centers, is answered in a timely manner by a person, consistent with the guidance established by the American Association of Suicidology. The plan shall include guidelines for periodic VCL testing.

The VA shall submit the document and plan within 180 days.