There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Cyber Preparedness Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

Cyber Preparedness Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Cyber Preparedness Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to enhance preparedness and response capabilities for cyber attacks, bolster the dissemination of homeland security information related to cyber threats, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5880)
09/19/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-756.
06/13/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/27/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/26/2016-3:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2016-3:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5880)
09/26/2016-3:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5459.
09/26/2016-3:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5880-5881)
09/26/2016-3:05pmHouseMr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/19/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 588.
09/19/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-756.
09/13/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/13/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/16/2016HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Communications
06/16/2016HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Communications
06/14/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/14/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/13/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
06/13/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/13/2016
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 06/13/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/13/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security06/13/2016 Referred to
09/13/2016 Markup by
09/19/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-756
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Communications06/14/2016 Referred to
06/16/2016 Markup by
06/16/2016 Reported by
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies06/14/2016 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/27/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5459. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/26/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on September 19, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Cyber Preparedness Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security's (DHS's) State, Local, and Regional Fusion Center Initiative to coordinate with the national cybersecurity and communications integration center (NCCIC) to provide state, local, and regional fusion centers with expertise on DHS cybersecurity resources. (A fusion center serves as a focal point within the state and local environment for the receipt, analysis, gathering, and sharing of threat-related information between the federal government and state, local, tribal, territorial, and private sector partners.)

DHS must: (1) provide timely access to technical assistance, risk management support, and incident response capabilities for cybersecurity threat indicators, defensive measures, risks, and incidents, including cybersecurity risks to equipment and technology related to the electoral process; (2) review cybersecurity risk information gathered by fusion centers to incorporate into DHS's cybersecurity risk information; and (3) disseminate cybersecurity risk information to fusion centers.

Fusion center officers or intelligence analysts may be assigned from the NCCIC. Such officers and analysts must assist fusion centers in using cybersecurity risk information to develop a comprehensive and accurate threat picture.

The NCCIC may include, and must share analysis and best practices with, state and major urban area fusion centers.

(Sec. 3) States, local or tribal governments, or high-risk urban areas receiving grants to protect against terrorism under the Urban Area Security Initiative or the State Homeland Security Grant Program may use the funds to: (1) prepare for and respond to cybersecurity risks and incidents, and (2) develop statewide cyber threat information analysis and dissemination activities.

(Sec. 4) The bill expresses the sense of Congress that DHS should share actionable information related to cyber threats in an unclassified form to facilitate timely dissemination to state, local, and private sector stakeholders.