There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Voting Access Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Help America Vote Act of 2002 to require States to meet standards for the location and operation of polling places used in elections for Federal office, including a standard requiring States to ensure that no individual waits for longer than one hour to cast a vote at a polling place, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/15/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/15/2016Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/15/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/21/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/21/2016
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/21/2016
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/21/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/21/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/21/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/22/2016
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/22/2016
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/22/2016
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/24/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/24/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/24/2016
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/01/2016
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/01/2016
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/01/2016
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/01/2016
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/01/2016
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/01/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/06/2016
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/06/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/06/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/06/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/07/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/12/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/12/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/13/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/13/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/14/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/08/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/08/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/08/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/12/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/15/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/15/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/15/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/30/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/30/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/30/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration06/15/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5488.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5488. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/15/2016)

Voting Access Act

This bill amends the Help America Vote Act of 2002 to require each state to comply with national standards established by the Election Assistance Commission for the location and operation of polling places used in elections for federal office.

The Commission shall establish such standards and study instances of the misidentification by election officials of the political party registration of individuals attempting to vote in primary elections for federal office.