There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Agency Accountability Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the appropriation of funds to use a fee, fine, penalty, or proceeds from a settlement received by a Federal agency, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/16/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
06/21/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/16/2016Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/16/2016Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/16/2016Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/16/2016Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/16/2016Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/16/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (95)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/16/2016
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/16/2016
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/16/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 06/16/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 06/16/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 06/16/2016
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 06/21/2016
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 06/21/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/22/2016
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 07/14/2016
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/06/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/06/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/06/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 09/07/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/07/2016
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/08/2016
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 09/09/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/12/2016
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/12/2016
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/12/2016
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/12/2016
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/13/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 09/13/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 09/13/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 09/13/2016
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/13/2016
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/15/2016
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 09/15/2016
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 09/15/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 09/15/2016
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/15/2016
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/21/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 09/21/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/22/2016
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/22/2016
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/22/2016

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/16/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary06/16/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law06/21/2016 Referred to
House Budget06/16/2016 Referred to
House Rules06/16/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5499. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/16/2016)

Agency Accountability Act of 2016

This bill requires any agency that receives a fee, fine, penalty, or proceeds from a settlement to deposit the amount in the general fund of the Treasury. The funds may not be used unless the funding is provided in advance in an appropriations bill.

Any amounts deposited during the fiscal year in which this bill is enacted may not be obligated during the fiscal year and must be used for deficit reduction.

The bill amends the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 to require offsetting receipts and collections to be treated as revenue. (Offsetting receipts and collections are funds collected by agencies from other government accounts or from the public in businesslike or market-oriented transactions. Under current law, the collections are treated as negative budget authority and outlays rather than revenue and may be used to offset spending for budget enforcement purposes.)

The requirements of the bill do not apply to the U.S. Postal Service or the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO). The Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and the Director of the USPTO must submit annually to Congress a report describing any fee, fine, penalty, or proceeds from a settlement collected by the USPTO during the previous year.