There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Prevent Interruptions in Physical Therapy Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to add physical therapists to the list of providers allowed to utilize locum tenens arrangements under Medicare, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/27/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
02/27/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/30/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/27/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/27/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/27/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/27/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (105)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 01/27/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/03/2015
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/10/2015
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/11/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/11/2015
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/11/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/13/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 02/13/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/24/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/26/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/13/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/13/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/13/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/13/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/24/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 03/24/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/13/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/15/2015
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/28/2015
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/28/2015
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/14/2015
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/15/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/19/2015
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/19/2015
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 05/19/2015
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/02/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/02/2015
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/02/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 06/03/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/03/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/09/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/09/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/09/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/09/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/09/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 06/09/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/09/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/09/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/09/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/09/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 06/12/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/12/2015
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/12/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/12/2015
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/12/2015
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 06/18/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 06/18/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/18/2015
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/18/2015
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 06/25/2015
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/25/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/25/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/08/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/08/2015
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 07/14/2015
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/14/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/21/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 07/21/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/21/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/28/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/28/2015
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/29/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/08/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/08/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/08/2015
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/08/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/08/2015
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 09/08/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/10/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/10/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/22/2015
Rep. Graham, Gwen [D-FL-2] 09/22/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/25/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 10/21/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 11/03/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/18/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 11/18/2015
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 12/15/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/18/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/02/2016
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/15/2016
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/11/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/11/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/14/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/14/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/14/2016
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/14/2016
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/18/2016
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 04/20/2016
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/21/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/27/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/27/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 04/27/2016
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/23/2016
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 07/05/2016
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/06/2016
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/13/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/21/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/07/2016
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 09/28/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/27/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/30/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/27/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/27/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.556. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/27/2015)

Prevent Interruptions in Physical Therapy Act of 2015

Amends part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance) of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to require physical therapists furnishing outpatient physical therapy services to use specified locum tenens arrangements for payment purposes in the same manner as such arrangements are used to apply to physicians furnishing substitute physicians services for other physicians.

(Locum tenens [place holder], or substitute, physicians usually assume professional practices in the absence of a regular physician for reasons such as illness, pregnancy, vacation, or continuing medical education.)