There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Survivors' Bill of Rights Act of 2016

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Survivors' Bill of Rights Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

Survivors' Bill of Rights Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Survivors' Bill of Rights Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish certain rights for sexual assault survivors, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
10/07/2016Became Public Law No: 114-236. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2016Signed by President.
10/03/2016Presented to President.
09/28/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/28/2016Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6198-6199)
09/06/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 0 (Roll no. 479).(text: CR H5045-5046)
09/06/2016Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
09/06/2016Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-707, Part I.
06/24/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/07/2016Became Public Law No: 114-236. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2016Signed by President.
10/03/2016HousePresented to President.
09/28/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/28/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/28/2016SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6198-6199)
09/07/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
09/06/2016-6:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/06/2016-6:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 0 (Roll no. 479). (text: CR H5045-5046)
09/06/2016-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5071)
09/06/2016-4:34pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/06/2016-4:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5578.
09/06/2016-4:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5045-5049)
09/06/2016-4:20pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/06/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 546.
09/06/2016HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
09/06/2016HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-707, Part I.
07/07/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/07/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/05/2016HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged.
06/30/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/24/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/24/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/24/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/24/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/24/2016
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 06/24/2016
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/28/2016
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/28/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/28/2016
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/28/2016
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/01/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/06/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/07/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/08/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/11/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/12/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/13/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 07/21/2016
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/06/2016
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/06/2016

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/24/2016 Referred to
07/07/2016 Markup by
09/06/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-707
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations06/30/2016 Referred to
07/05/2016 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce06/24/2016 Referred to
09/06/2016 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary09/07/2016 Referred to
09/28/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5578. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-236 (10/07/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Survivors' Bill of Rights Act of 2016

(Sec. 3) This bill amends the federal criminal code to establish statutory rights for sexual assault survivors, including the right to: (1) not be prevented from receiving a forensic medical examination and not be charged for an examination; (2) have a sexual assault evidence collection kit (i.e., a rape kit) preserved for 20 years or the maximum applicable statute of limitations, whichever is shorter; (3) receive written notification prior to destruction or disposal of a rape kit; and (4) be informed of these rights and policies.

Additionally, it makes statutory crime victims' rights applicable to sexual assault survivors.

The term "sexual assault" means any nonconsensual sexual act prohibited by federal, state, or tribal law, including when a victim lacks capacity to consent.

Funds made available to the Crime Victims Fund under the Victims of Crime Act of 1984 must be used to carry out the requirements concerning these rights, subject to specified exceptions.

The bill amends the Victims of Crime Act of 1984 to authorize the Department of Justice's (DOJ's) Office of Justice Programs to make grants to states to develop sexual assault survivors' rights and policies and to disseminate written notice of such rights and policies to medical centers, hospitals, forensic examiners, sexual assault service providers, law enforcement agencies, and other state entities.

(Sec. 4) DOJ must establish a working group to develop, coordinate, and disseminate best practices regarding the care and treatment of sexual assault survivors and the preservation of forensic evidence.