There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

No Hero Left Untreated Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

No Hero Left Untreated Act

Short Titles as Introduced

No Hero Left Untreated Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a pilot program to provide access to magnetic EEG/EKG-guided resonance therapy technology to veterans.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/29/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text of measure as passed: CR H6343)
11/14/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-817.
06/28/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
11/30/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
11/29/2016-5:27pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/29/2016-5:27pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H6343)
11/29/2016-5:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5600.
11/29/2016-5:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6343-6344)
11/29/2016-5:19pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/14/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 641.
11/14/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-817.
09/21/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/21/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/05/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/28/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/28/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/28/2016 Referred to
09/21/2016 Markup by
11/14/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-817
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health07/05/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5600. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/29/2016)

No Hero Left Untreated Act

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out a one-year pilot program to provide access to magnetic EEG/EKG-guided resonance therapy to treat larger populations of veterans suffering from post-traumatic stress disorder, traumatic brain injury, military sexual trauma, chronic pain, or opiate addiction.

The VA shall carry out the program at up to two VA facilities and may provide access to such therapy to up to 50 veterans.