There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Iran Accountability Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Iran Accountability Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To hold Iran accountable for its state sponsorship of terrorism and other threatening activities and for its human rights abuses, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/14/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 246 - 179 (Roll no. 467).(text: CR H4939-4947)
07/06/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
07/15/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/14/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
07/14/2016-1:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/14/2016-1:04pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 246 - 179 (Roll no. 467). (text: CR H4939-4947)
07/14/2016-12:57pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4965-4966)
07/14/2016-11:30amHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 5631, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Royce demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage of the bill until later in the legislative day.
07/14/2016-11:29amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
07/14/2016-10:15amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5631.
07/14/2016-10:15amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4992, H.R. 5119 and H.R. 5631 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
07/14/2016-10:14amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 819. (consideration: CR H4939-4957)
07/12/2016-3:36pmHouseRule H. Res. 819 passed House.
07/11/2016-10:03pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 819 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4992, H.R. 5119 and H.R. 5631 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
07/06/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/06/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Ways and Means, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/06/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Ways and Means, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/06/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Ways and Means, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/06/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Ways and Means, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/06/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Ways and Means, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/06/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Ways and Means, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/06/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Ways and Means, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/06/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (7)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/06/2016 Referred to
House Financial Services07/06/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary07/06/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security07/06/2016 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform07/06/2016 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/06/2016 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade07/15/2016 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)07/06/2016 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations07/14/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5631. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/14/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Iran Accountability Act of 2016

This bill prescribes requirements for mandatory sanctions with respect to:

  • Iran's Revolutionary Guard Corps (IRGC), its agents, and persons or entities it owns;
  • Mahan Air;
  • Iran's support of terrorism and money laundering;
  • Iran's human rights abuses;
  • certain Iranian individuals, including the Supreme Leader of Iran and the President of Iran;
  • persons who conduct transactions with or on behalf of certain Iranian individuals;
  • persons that support or are involved in Iran's ballistic missile program; and
  • financial institutions that engage in certain transactions on behalf of persons involved in human rights abuses or that export sensitive technology to Iran.

The Department of the Treasury must establish and publish in the Federal Register an IRGC watch list.

The bill prescribes prohibitions against Iran's access to the U.S. financial system.

The bill authorizes the Department of State to provide assistance to individuals and entities working in Iran to promote the rule of law and economic opportunity.

The Iran-Iraq Arms Non-Proliferation Act of 1992 is amended to cover ballistic missiles and related technology.

The President is directed to: (1) designate within the State Department a Special Coordinator on Human Rights and Democracy in Iran; and (2) report on U.S. citizens, including dual citizens, detained by Iran or related groups.

The bill requires Radio Free Europe/Radio Liberty and the Voice of America to increase programing services to Iran.