There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 6300 N. Northwest Highway in Chicago, Illinois, as the "Officer Joseph P. Cali Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/16/2016Became Public Law No: 114-300. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2016Signed by President.
12/14/2016Presented to President.
12/10/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7103)
12/05/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6684)
11/17/2016Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
09/20/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5675)
07/07/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
12/16/2016Became Public Law No: 114-300. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2016Signed by President.
12/14/2016HousePresented to President.
12/12/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/10/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7103)
12/05/2016SenateReturned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 681.
12/05/2016SenateSenate vitiated previous passage. (consideration: CR S6688, S6716)
12/05/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6684)
11/17/2016SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 681.
11/17/2016SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
11/17/2016SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
09/21/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/20/2016-4:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/20/2016-4:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5675)
09/20/2016-4:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5676.
09/20/2016-4:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5675-5676)
09/20/2016-4:08pmHouseMr. Hice, Jody B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/15/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
09/15/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/07/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
07/07/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform07/07/2016 Referred to
09/15/2016 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/21/2016 Referred to
11/17/2016 Markup by
11/17/2016 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.5676.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5676. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-300 (12/16/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 6300 N. Northwest Highway in Chicago, Illinois, as the "Officer Joseph P. Cali Post Office Building."