There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Affairs Retaliation Prevention Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the treatment of whistleblower complaints by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/27/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date All Actions
05/21/2015Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/21/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/21/2015Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations
04/21/2015Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations
03/19/2015Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations
03/13/2015Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged.
02/06/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/06/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/27/2015Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/27/2015Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/27/2015Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/27/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (15)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs01/27/2015 Referred to
05/21/2015 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations02/06/2015 Referred to
03/19/2015 Hearings by
04/21/2015 Markup by
04/21/2015 Reported by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity02/06/2015 Referred to
03/13/2015 Discharged from
House Oversight and Government Reform01/27/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.571. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/27/2015)

Veterans Affairs Retaliation Prevention Act of 2015

Authorizes a Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) employee to file a whistleblower complaint with his or her immediate supervisor. Gives that supervisor two business days to determine and notify the employee as to whether there is a reasonable likelihood that the complaint discloses a violation of any law, rule, or regulation, gross mismanagement, a gross waste of funds, an abuse of authority, or substantial and specific danger to public health and safety. Requires that supervisor to include in the employee notification specific actions that the supervisor will take to address a complaint deemed reasonably valid.

Authorizes an employee whose supervisor fails to make a timely determination regarding the complaint or address the complaint to the employee's satisfaction, to file such complaint with the next-level supervisor, who shall make a determination regarding the complaint in accordance with the procedures this Act requires the immediate supervisor to follow.

Authorizes an employee to file a whistleblower complaint with the VA Secretary if the employee has filed such complaint with each level of supervisors between the employee and the Secretary in accordance with such procedures.

Requires each employee who receives a positive determination from a supervisor regarding a complaint to be: (1) informed by the Secretary of the employee's ability to volunteer for a transfer, and (2) given transfer preference.

Directs the Secretary to carry out the following adverse actions against VA employees who are determined to have committed a prohibited personnel action relating to whistleblower complaints: (1) not less than a 14-day suspension, and not more than removal, for a first offense, and (2) removal for a second offense. Gives employees no more than five days following notification of such a proposed adverse action to dispute it.

Requires the Secretary to charge an offending employee a fee that takes into account the costs borne by the federal government due to such prohibited personnel action.

Requires the Secretary, when evaluating a supervisor's performance, to take into account any failure to follow this Act's procedures or any commission of a prohibited personnel action relating to a whistleblower complaint. Denies awards or bonuses to supervisors found to have committed such prohibited personnel actions.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) provide each VA employee with annual training regarding whistleblower complaints; (2) provide annual training on merit system protection that the Special Counsel certifies as satisfactory; and (3) publish on the VA's website and prominently display at VA facilities the rights of an employee to file, and to petition Congress regarding, a whistleblower complaint.