There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

No U.S. Financing for Iran Act

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • No Ex-Im Assistance for Terrorism Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the Secretary of the Treasury from authorizing certain transactions by a U.S. financial institution in connection with the export or re-export of a commercial passenger aircraft to the Islamic Republic of Iran.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/17/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 174 (Roll no. 587).
11/14/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-810.
07/11/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
11/28/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
11/17/2016-12:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/17/2016-12:02pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 174 (Roll no. 587).
11/17/2016-11:56amHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 181 - 235 (Roll no. 586). (consideration: CR H6288-6289)
11/17/2016-11:49amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6288-6289)
11/17/2016-11:49amHouseThe Chair announced that the unfinished business and pursuant to a previous order of the House, the question was on adoption of a motion to recommit with instructions, which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
11/16/2016-7:09pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on adopting the motion and by voice vote, announced that the nays had prevailed. Mr. Swalwell (CA) demanded the yeas and nays, and pursuant to a previous order of the House, the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit with instructions until a time to be announced.
11/16/2016-7:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add a section to prohibit the Secretary of the Treasury from authorizing a transaction described under section 101 by a U.S. financial institution if such institution is engaged in business with a foreign entity that has been found to have engaged in or authorized cyber attacks targeting any election held in the United States.
11/16/2016-7:02pmHouseMr. Swalwell (CA) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (consideration: CR H6264; text: CR H6264)
11/16/2016-7:01pmHouseH.Amdt.1480 On agreeing to the Huizenga (MI) amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
11/16/2016-7:01pmHouseH.Amdt.1480 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H6264)
11/16/2016-6:53pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 921, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Huizenga (MI) amendment.
11/16/2016-6:52pmHouseH.Amdt.1480 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Huizenga (MI). (consideration: CR H6263-6264; text: CR H6263)
11/16/2016-5:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5711.
11/16/2016-5:48pmHouseThe rule provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 5711 and H.R. 5982.
11/16/2016-5:47pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 921. (consideration: CR H6255-6265; text of measure as reported in House: CR H6255-6256)
11/16/2016-5:47pmHouseORDER OF PROCEDURE - Mr. Huizenga (MI) asked unanimous consent that the question of adopting a motion to recommit on H.R. 5711 be subject to postponement as though under Clause 8 of Rule 20. Agreed to without objection.
11/14/2016-7:31pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 921 Reported to House. The rule provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 5711 and H.R. 5982.
11/14/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 634.
11/14/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-810.
07/13/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 21.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/13/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/11/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
07/11/2016HouseIntroduced in House
07/07/2016HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade Prior to Introduction and Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 07/11/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services07/11/2016 Referred to
07/13/2016 Markup by
11/14/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-810
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade07/07/2016 Hearings by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs11/28/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5711. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/17/2016)

No U.S. Financing for Iran Act

TITLE I--IRAN FINANCING PROHIBITION

(Sec. 101) This bill prohibits the Department of the Treasury from authorizing U.S. financial institution transactions in connection with the export or re-export of commercial passenger aircraft to the Islamic Republic of Iran.

(Sec. 102) Any transaction authorized by Treasury before enactment of this bill is revoked.

TITLE II--NO EX-IM ASSISTANCE FOR TERRORISM

No Ex-Im Assistance for Terrorism Act

(Sec. 202) This bill amends the Export-Import Bank Act of 1945 to prohibit the Export-Import Bank from guaranteeing, insuring, extending credit, or participating in the extension of credit in connection with the export of U.S. goods or services sought by:

  • the Government of Iran, an entity owned or controlled by it, an entity created under Iranian law, or a foreign subsidiary of such an entity;
  • an entity involving the Government of Iran, owned or controlled by the Government of Iran, created under Iranian law, or a foreign subsidiary of such an entity; or
  • a non-U.S. entity that, in the last five-years, has leased or sold aircraft to the Government of Iran, or a subsidiary or controlling parent of such a non-U.S. entity.

The Bank must cancel approved financing if it finds that such financing has facilitated the export, sale, or lease of an aircraft to the Government of Iran or a related entity and must seek immediate recovery of any amount it has provided in connection with the transaction.

TITLE III--SUNSET

(Sec. 301) This bill shall cease to be effective 30 days after the President certifies to Congress that the Government of Iran has ceased support for acts of international terrorism.