There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Overtime Reform and Enhancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Labor to revise rules relating to changes to the exemptions from overtime pay requirements for certain employees to provide a gradual schedule for such changes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/14/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/14/2016Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/14/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce07/14/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5813.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5813. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/14/2016)

Overtime Reform and Enhancement Act

This bill directs the Department of Labor, by December 1, 2016, to revise the rule published in the Federal Register on May 23, 2016, relating to exemptions (from the minimum wage and overtime pay requirements of the Fair Labor Standards Act) regarding the rates of pay for executive, administrative, professional, outside sales, and computer employees.

Labor shall revise specified regulations to increase the defining rates of pay of exempted employees from $455 per week to:

  • $692 per week for executive employees effective December 1, 2016;
  • $765 per week for administrative employees effective December 1, 2017;
  • $839 per week for professional employees effective December 1, 2018; and
  • $913 per week for computer employees effective December 1, 2019; and

Such revisions shall also nullify the automatic updates to the amounts of salary and compensation required for such exemptions.

Labor may only update any rate of pay related to these exemptions in accordance with federal rulemaking requirements.