There is one summary for H.R.5813. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/14/2016)

Overtime Reform and Enhancement Act

This bill directs the Department of Labor, by December 1, 2016, to revise the rule published in the Federal Register on May 23, 2016, relating to exemptions (from the minimum wage and overtime pay requirements of the Fair Labor Standards Act) regarding the rates of pay for executive, administrative, professional, outside sales, and computer employees.

Labor shall revise specified regulations to increase the defining rates of pay of exempted employees from $455 per week to:

  • $692 per week for executive employees effective December 1, 2016;
  • $765 per week for administrative employees effective December 1, 2017;
  • $839 per week for professional employees effective December 1, 2018; and
  • $913 per week for computer employees effective December 1, 2019; and

Such revisions shall also nullify the automatic updates to the amounts of salary and compensation required for such exemptions.

Labor may only update any rate of pay related to these exemptions in accordance with federal rulemaking requirements.