There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Resettlement Accountability National Security Prioritization Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To suspend, and subsequently terminate, the admission of certain refugees, to examine the impact on the national security of the United States of admitting refugees, to examine the costs of providing benefits to such individuals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/14/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
08/11/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/14/2016Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/14/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 07/14/2016
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 07/14/2016
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 09/06/2016
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/21/2016
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 09/26/2016
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/26/2016
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/26/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/14/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security08/11/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5816. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/14/2016)

Resettlement Accountability National Security Prioritization Act of 2016

This bill prohibits the admission of covered aliens into the United States for four years unless Congress passes a joint resolution giving the Department of Homeland Security authority to admit them. No covered alien may be admitted into the United States after such four-year period.

"Covered alien" means an alien applying for refugee admission to the United States who: (1) is a national of Afghanistan, Iraq, Libya, Somalia, Syria, or Yemen; or (2) has no nationality and whose last habitual residence was in Afghanistan, Iraq, Libya, Somalia, Syria, or Yemen.

The Government Accountability Office shall report on: (1) the national security impact of refugee admissions; and (2) specified costs of providing refugees with benefits under Medicare, Medicaid, disability insurance under title II of the Social Security Act, the supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP, formerly the food stamp program), and section 8 rental assistance.