There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

United States-Israel Cybersecurity Cooperation Enhancement Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

United States-Israel Cybersecurity Cooperation Enhancement Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

United States-Israel Cybersecurity Cooperation Enhancement Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a grant program at the Department of Homeland Security to promote cooperative research and development between the United States and Israel on cybersecurity.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/29/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text of measure as passed: CR H6335)
11/15/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-826.
07/14/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/30/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
11/29/2016-7:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/29/2016-7:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H6335)
11/29/2016-7:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6353)
11/29/2016-4:35pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Ratcliffe objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
11/29/2016-4:25pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5843.
11/29/2016-4:25pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6335-6336)
11/29/2016-4:25pmHouseMr. Ratcliffe moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/15/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 648.
11/15/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-826.
09/13/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/13/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
08/03/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/14/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
07/14/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 07/14/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security07/14/2016 Referred to
09/13/2016 Markup by
11/15/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-826
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies08/03/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5843.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5843. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/29/2016)

United States-Israel Cybersecurity Cooperation Enhancement Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish a grant program to support cybersecurity research and development, and the demonstration and commercialization of cybersecurity technology, in accordance with the Agreement between the Government of the United States of America and the Government of the State of Israel on Cooperation in Science and Technology for Homeland Security Matters, dated May 29, 2008, or a successor agreement.

Grants may be awarded for social science research and technology intended to identify, protect against, respond to, and recover from cybersecurity threats.

To be eligible for a grant, a project must be a joint venture between: (1) for-profit, nonprofit, or academic entities (including U.S. national laboratories) in the United States and Israel; or (2) the governments of the United States and Israel.

Grants shall be awarded only for projects considered unclassified by both the United States and Israel.

DHS must require cost sharing of at least 50% from nonfederal sources for grant activities, but it may reduce the nonfederal percentage if necessary on a case-by-case basis.

DHS must establish an advisory board to monitor the impartial scientific and technical merit method by which grants are awarded and provide periodic reviews of the actions taken to carry out the program.

The grant program terminates seven years after this bill's enactment.