There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Eliminate So-Called Right-to-Work Legislation Nationwide Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal a limitation in the Labor-Management Relations Act regarding requirements for labor organization membership as a condition of employment.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/14/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/19/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
07/14/2016Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/14/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 07/14/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/14/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/25/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/08/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 12/08/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 12/08/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce07/14/2016 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions09/19/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5894.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5894. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/14/2016)

Eliminate So-Called Right-to-Work Legislation Nationwide Act of 2016

This bill amends the National Labor Relations Act to repeal the disclaimer that nothing in the law shall be construed as authorizing the execution or application of agreements requiring membership in a labor organization as a condition of employment in any state or territory in which such execution or application is prohibited by state or territorial law.

(The bill preempts contrary state or territorial law to allow the execution or application of agreements requiring union membership.)