There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Dialysis PATIENTS Demonstration Act of 2016
Dialysis Patient Access To Integrated-care, Empowerment, Nephrologists, Treatment, and Services Demonstration Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to establish a demonstration program to provide integrated care for Medicare beneficiaries with end-stage renal disease, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/07/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
09/08/2016Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/08/2016Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/07/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/07/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/07/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/07/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/07/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/07/2016
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/07/2016
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 09/07/2016
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/08/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 09/08/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/08/2016
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/08/2016
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 09/08/2016
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 09/08/2016
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/08/2016
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/08/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/08/2016
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/08/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/08/2016
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/08/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/08/2016
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/08/2016
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/08/2016
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 09/08/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/08/2016
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/08/2016
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/08/2016
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 09/08/2016
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/08/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/09/2016
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 09/09/2016
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/09/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/09/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/09/2016
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/09/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 09/12/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/12/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/12/2016
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/12/2016
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/12/2016
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/12/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 09/13/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/13/2016
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/13/2016
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/15/2016
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/15/2016
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/15/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/15/2016
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 09/15/2016
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/15/2016
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/15/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 09/15/2016
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/15/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/15/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/20/2016
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/20/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/20/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/21/2016
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/22/2016
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/22/2016
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 09/22/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/22/2016
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 09/22/2016
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/28/2016
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/28/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 09/28/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/15/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/15/2016
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 11/15/2016
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/15/2016
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 11/15/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/07/2016 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/07/2016 Referred to
09/08/2016 Markup by
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health09/07/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5942. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/07/2016)

Dialysis PATIENTS Demonstration Act of 2016 or the Dialysis Patient Access to Integrated-care, Empowerment, Nephrologists, Treatment, and Services Demonstration Act of 2016

This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to establish a demonstration program for the provision of integrated care to Medicare beneficiaries with end-stage renal disease (ESRD).

Under the voluntary program, eligible participating providers may form organizations to offer ESRD integrated care models and serve as medical homes for program-eligible beneficiaries. Such a model: (1) shall cover medical and hospital services, other than hospice care, under Medicare; (2) must include benefits for transition into palliative care; and (3) may cover prescription drug benefits. An organization must offer at least one open network model but may also offer one or more preferred network models.

An organization shall return savings achieved under the models to program-eligible beneficiaries.

A beneficiary shall have the opportunity to: (1) opt out of the program, (2) make an assignment change into an open network model offered by a different organization, or (3) elect a preferred network model.

The bill establishes requirements regarding: (1) benefits for program-eligible beneficiaries who are also eligible for Medicaid benefits, (2) program quality and reporting, (2) ESRD integrated care strategy, (3) program operation and scope, (4) beneficiary notification, and (5) payment.