There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Transparency and Accuracy in Medicare Part D Spending Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to prohibit prescription drug plan sponsors and MA-PD organizations under the Medicare program from retroactively reducing payment on clean claims submitted by pharmacies.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/08/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
09/12/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/08/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/08/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/08/2016Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/08/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 09/08/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/08/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 09/08/2016
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/08/2016
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 09/08/2016
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 09/08/2016
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 09/08/2016
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/08/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/09/2016
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 09/09/2016
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/13/2016
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/13/2016
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/19/2016
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 09/19/2016
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/19/2016
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/19/2016
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/19/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/22/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 09/22/2016
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/22/2016
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/22/2016
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/27/2016
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/27/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/14/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 11/14/2016
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/14/2016
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/14/2016
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 11/14/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 11/14/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 11/14/2016
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/16/2016
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/16/2016
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 11/16/2016
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/17/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 11/30/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/08/2016 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/08/2016 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health09/12/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5951. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/08/2016)

Improving Transparency and Accuracy in Medicare Part D Spending Act

This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to prohibit Medicare Prescription Drug Plan sponsors from retroactively reducing payment on clean claims submitted by pharmacies. (A "clean claim" is a Medicare claim that is free of defects such as incomplete documentation.)