There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Mark Takai Atomic Veterans Healthcare Parity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the treatment of veterans who participated in the cleanup of Enewetak Atoll as radiation exposed veterans for purposes of the presumption of service-connection of certain disabilities by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/09/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/09/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/09/2016Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (107)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 09/09/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/09/2016
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/09/2016
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 09/12/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/12/2016
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/12/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/12/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/13/2016
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/13/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/13/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/13/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/14/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/14/2016
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/14/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 09/14/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/14/2016
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/14/2016
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 09/14/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/14/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/14/2016
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 09/14/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/14/2016
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/15/2016
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/15/2016
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/15/2016
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 09/19/2016
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 09/19/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/19/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/19/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 09/19/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/19/2016
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 09/19/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/19/2016
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 09/19/2016
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/19/2016
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/19/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/19/2016
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 09/19/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/19/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/19/2016
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/19/2016
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 09/19/2016
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 09/20/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/20/2016
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/20/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/20/2016
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/20/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/20/2016
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/20/2016
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/20/2016
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/20/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/20/2016
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/20/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 09/21/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/21/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/21/2016
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 09/21/2016
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 09/22/2016
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/22/2016
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 09/22/2016
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/22/2016
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/22/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 09/26/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 09/26/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/26/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/26/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/26/2016
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 09/27/2016
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/27/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/27/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/27/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/27/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/27/2016
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/27/2016
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/27/2016
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/28/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/28/2016
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/28/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/14/2016
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/14/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/14/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 11/14/2016
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 11/14/2016
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 11/14/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 11/16/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/30/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/09/2016 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs09/09/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5980. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/09/2016)

Mark Takai Atomic Veterans Healthcare Parity Act

This bill includes veterans who participated in the cleanup of Enewetak Atoll in the Marshall Islands between January 1, 1977, and December 31, 1980, as radiation exposed veterans for purposes of the Department of Veterans Affairs presumption of service-connection for specified cancers.