There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

GAO Civilian Task and Delivery Order Protest Authority Act of 2016

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

GAO Civilian Task and Delivery Order Protest Authority Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

GAO Civilian Task and Delivery Order Protest Authority Act of 2016

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

GAO Civilian Task and Delivery Order Protest Authority Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To strike the sunset on certain provisions relating to the authorized protest of a task or delivery order under section 4106 of title 41, United States Code.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/14/2016Became Public Law No: 114-260. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016Signed by President.
12/05/2016Presented to President.
11/30/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6627)
09/21/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H5745)
09/21/2016Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-779.
09/12/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/14/2016Became Public Law No: 114-260. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016Signed by President.
12/05/2016HousePresented to President.
12/01/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/30/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6627)
09/22/2016SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/21/2016-3:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/21/2016-3:03pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5745)
09/21/2016-3:03pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5745)
09/21/2016-3:03pmHouseMr. Meadows asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
09/21/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 608.
09/21/2016HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-779.
09/15/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
09/15/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
09/12/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
09/12/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/12/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform09/12/2016 Referred to
09/15/2016 Markup by
09/21/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-779

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5995. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-260 (12/14/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

GAO Civilian Task and Delivery Order Protest Authority Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill makes permanent the Government Accountability Office's (GAO's) authority to hear a contractor's protest regarding the issuance or proposed issuance of a civilian federal agency's task or delivery order contract for the procurement of services or property valued in excess of $10 million. (Under current law, the GAO's jurisdiction over protests relating to federal defense contracts is already permanent, but the protest authority for civilian federal agency contracts is scheduled to expire after September 30, 2016.)