There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to include consideration of certain impacts on commercial space launch and reentry activities in a navigable airspace analysis, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
11/28/2016Became Public Law No: 114-248. (TXT | PDF)
11/28/2016Signed by President.
11/18/2016Presented to President.
11/16/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6421)
09/21/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 425 - 0 (Roll no. 538).(text: CR 09/20/2016 H5696)
09/13/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
11/28/2016Became Public Law No: 114-248. (TXT | PDF)
11/28/2016Signed by President.
11/18/2016HousePresented to President.
11/17/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/16/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6421)
09/22/2016SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/21/2016-6:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/21/2016-6:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 425 - 0 (Roll no. 538). (text: CR 09/20/2016 H5696)
09/21/2016-6:27pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5765-5766)
09/20/2016-7:19pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/20/2016-7:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6007.
09/20/2016-7:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5696-5697)
09/20/2016-7:13pmHouseMr. Graves (MO) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/14/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/13/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
09/13/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 09/14/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/13/2016 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation09/14/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6007.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6007. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-248 (11/28/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill directs the Department of Transportation (DOT), if it decides that constructing or altering a structure may result in interference with space navigation facilities and equipment, to study the extent of any adverse impact that may result on the safe and efficient use of airspace, facilities, or equipment.

In conducting such a study, DOT shall consider the impact on launch and reentry for launch and reentry vehicles arriving or departing from a launch site or reentry site.