There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Airport Construction and Alteration Reform Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To allow the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration to enter into reimbursable agreements for certain airport projects.

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Federal Aviation Administration to allow certain construction or alteration of structures by State departments of transportation without requiring an aeronautical study, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/16/2016Became Public Law No: 114-307. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2016Signed by President.
12/15/2016Presented to President.
12/01/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/01/2016Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6680)
09/21/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 425 - 0 (Roll no. 540).(text: CR 09/20/2016 H5700)
09/13/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
12/16/2016Became Public Law No: 114-307. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2016Signed by President.
12/15/2016HousePresented to President.
12/02/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/01/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/01/2016SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6680)
09/22/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
09/21/2016-6:46pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/21/2016-6:46pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/21/2016-6:46pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 425 - 0 (Roll no. 540). (text: CR 09/20/2016 H5700)
09/21/2016-6:40pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5766-5767)
09/20/2016-7:43pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/20/2016-7:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6014.
09/20/2016-7:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5700-5701)
09/20/2016-7:37pmHouseMr. Zeldin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/14/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/13/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
09/13/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/13/2016 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation09/14/2016 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/22/2016 Referred to
12/01/2016 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.6014.


Subjects (5)

  • Aviation and airports
  • Intergovernmental relations
  • State and local government operations
  • Transportation programs funding

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6014. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-307 (12/16/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on September 21, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill authorizes the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) to enter into a reimbursable agreement with a state or local government agency for airport construction or alteration projects requiring notice to the FAA, if the agreement:

  • includes cost-effective completion measures for such projects, and
  • would not negatively affect the safety or efficiency of the national airspace system.