There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Home Infusion Site of Care Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for the coverage of home as a site of care for infusion therapy under the Medicare program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/28/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
02/27/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/30/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/28/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/28/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/28/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/28/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/12/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/12/2015
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/26/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/04/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 03/17/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 03/19/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/19/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/15/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/15/2015
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/16/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/22/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/28/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/13/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/18/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/20/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/22/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/26/2015
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 06/03/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/03/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/17/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/23/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/07/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/15/2015
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/10/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/17/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/01/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/03/2016
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/03/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 02/23/2016
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/23/2016
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/02/2016
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/02/2016
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/03/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/03/2016
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/07/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/07/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/07/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/07/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/07/2016
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 03/07/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/10/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/10/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 03/10/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/14/2016
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/14/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 03/17/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 03/22/2016
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/22/2016
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 03/23/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/11/2016
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/11/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 04/11/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 04/11/2016
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/13/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/19/2016
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/03/2016
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/10/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/23/2016
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 05/27/2016
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/07/2016
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/07/2016
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/08/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/13/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/14/2016
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/20/2016
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/28/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/05/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/06/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/06/2016
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/07/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/08/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/12/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/13/2016
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/19/2016
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/14/2016
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/14/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/28/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/30/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/28/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/27/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.605. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/28/2015)

Medicare Home Infusion Site of Care Act of 2015

Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to authorize Medicare coverage of home infusion therapy and home infusion drugs.

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services to implement the Medicare home infusion therapy benefit in a manner that ensures that: (1) Medicare beneficiaries have timely and appropriate access to infusion therapy in their homes, and (2) there is rapid and seamless coordination between drug coverage under Medicare part D (Voluntary Prescription Drug Benefit Program) and home infusion therapy services coverage under Medicare part B (Supplemental Security Income) (SSI) to avoid the filing of duplicative or otherwise improper claims.