There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Don't Tax Our Fallen Public Safety Heroes Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Don't Tax Our Fallen Public Safety Heroes Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Don't Tax Our Fallen Public Safety Heroes Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Don't Tax Our Fallen Public Safety Heroes Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to exclude certain compensation received by public safety officers and their dependents from gross income.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
05/22/2015Became Public Law No: 114-14. (TXT | PDF)
05/22/2015Signed by President.
05/18/2015Presented to President.
05/14/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2913-2914)
05/12/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 216).(text: CR H2846)
01/28/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
05/22/2015Became Public Law No: 114-14. (TXT | PDF)
05/22/2015Signed by President.
05/18/2015HousePresented to President.
05/14/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/14/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2913-2914)
05/13/2015SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
05/12/2015-6:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/12/2015-6:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 216). (text: CR H2846)
05/12/2015-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2850)
05/12/2015-6:06pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/12/2015-5:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 606.
05/12/2015-5:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2846-2848)
05/12/2015-5:52pmHouseMr. Reichert moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/28/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
01/28/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/28/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.606. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-14 (05/22/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

Don't Tax Our Fallen Public Safety Heroes Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from gross income, for income tax purposes, amounts paid: (1) by the Bureau of Justice Assistance of the Department of Justice as a public safety officer survivor's benefit or a public safety officer disability benefit, or (2) under a state program that provides compensation for surviving dependents of a public safety officer who has died as the direct and proximate result of a personal injury sustained in the line of duty. The tax exclusion does not apply to any amounts that would have been payable if the death of the public safety officer had occurred other than as the direct and proximate result of a personal injury sustained in the line of duty.