There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Regulatory Relief for Small Businesses, Schools, and Nonprofits Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Regulatory Relief for Small Businesses, Schools, and Nonprofits Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for a 6-month delay in the effective date of a rule of the Department of Labor relating to income thresholds for determining overtime pay for executive, administrative, professional, outside sales, and computer employees.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/28/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 246 - 177 (Roll no. 574).(text: CR H6059)
09/21/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/15/2016SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 662.
09/29/2016SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
09/28/2016-10:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2016-10:15pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 246 - 177 (Roll no. 574). (text: CR H6059)
09/28/2016-10:07pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6095)
09/28/2016-7:33pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 6094, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Scott(VA) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage of the bill until later in the legislative day.
09/28/2016-7:32pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H6069)
09/28/2016-7:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House resumed with debate on H.R. 6094.
09/28/2016-6:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6094.
09/28/2016-6:23pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 897. (consideration: CR H6059-6069)
09/28/2016-3:21pmHouseRule H. Res. 897 passed House.
09/28/2016HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6059)
09/27/2016-11:48pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 897 Reported to House. Provides for further amendment debate to H.R. 5303. Each further amendment may be offered only in the order printed in the report. At the conclusion of consideration of amendments, the bill shall be reported back to the House with such amendments as may have been adopted. The previous question shall be ordered without intervening motions except one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Provides for one hour of general debate to H.R. 6094. The previous question shall be ordered without intervening motions except one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
09/21/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
09/21/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (76)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 09/22/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/22/2016
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/22/2016
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/22/2016
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/22/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/22/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/22/2016
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 09/22/2016
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 09/22/2016
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/22/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 09/22/2016
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 09/22/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/22/2016
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/22/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/22/2016
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 09/22/2016
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/22/2016
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/22/2016
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 09/26/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 09/26/2016
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/26/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 09/26/2016
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/26/2016
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/26/2016
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/26/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/26/2016
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/26/2016
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/26/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 09/26/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/26/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/26/2016
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/26/2016
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/26/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 09/26/2016
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/26/2016
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/26/2016
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/26/2016
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 09/26/2016
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 09/26/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/27/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 09/27/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 09/27/2016
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/27/2016
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/27/2016
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 09/28/2016
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 09/28/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce09/21/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6094. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/28/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Regulatory Relief for Small Businesses, Schools, and Nonprofits Act

(Sec. 2) This bill postpones from December 1, 2016, until June 1, 2017, the effective date of a final rule of the Department of Labor (81 Fed. Reg. 32552 [May 23, 2016]) revising income thresholds for determining overtime pay for executive, administrative, professional, outside sales, and computer ("white collar") employees exempt from regular minimum wage and overtime pay requirements.

Nothing in this bill shall be construed as providing authority for such rule, nor any part of it, that is not otherwise provided by law.