Text: H.R.6094 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (11/15/2016)

Calendar No. 662

114th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 6094


To provide for a 6-month delay in the effective date of a rule of the Department of Labor relating to income thresholds for determining overtime pay for executive, administrative, professional, outside sales, and computer employees.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

September 29, 2016

Received; read the first time

November 15, 2016

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To provide for a 6-month delay in the effective date of a rule of the Department of Labor relating to income thresholds for determining overtime pay for executive, administrative, professional, outside sales, and computer employees.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Regulatory Relief for Small Businesses, Schools, and Nonprofits Act”.

SEC. 2. Effective date of rule.

(a) Effective date.—Notwithstanding the effective date set forth in the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to exemptions regarding the rates of pay for executive, administrative, professional, outside sales, and computer employees (81 Fed. Reg. 32552 (May 23, 2016)), such rule shall not take effect until June 1, 2017.

(b) Rule of construction.—Nothing in this Act shall be construed to provide authority for the rule described in subsection (a), nor any part thereof, that is not otherwise provided by law.

Passed the House of Representatives September 28, 2016.

Attest:
Karen L. Haas,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 662

114th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 6094

AN ACT
To provide for a 6-month delay in the effective date of a rule of the Department of Labor relating to income thresholds for determining overtime pay for executive, administrative, professional, outside sales, and computer employees.

November 15, 2016
Read the second time and placed on the calendar