Text: H.R.6094 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (11/15/2016)

 
[Congressional Bills 114th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H.R. 6094 Placed on Calendar Senate (PCS)]

<DOC>





                                                       Calendar No. 662
114th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 6094


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                           September 29, 2016

                     Received; read the first time

                           November 15, 2016

            Read the second time and placed on the calendar

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT


 
 To provide for a 6-month delay in the effective date of a rule of the 
   Department of Labor relating to income thresholds for determining 
   overtime pay for executive, administrative, professional, outside 
                     sales, and computer employees.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Regulatory Relief for Small 
Businesses, Schools, and Nonprofits Act''.

SEC. 2. EFFECTIVE DATE OF RULE.

    (a) Effective Date.--Notwithstanding the effective date set forth 
in the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to exemptions 
regarding the rates of pay for executive, administrative, professional, 
outside sales, and computer employees (81 Fed. Reg. 32552 (May 23, 
2016)), such rule shall not take effect until June 1, 2017.
    (b) Rule of Construction.--Nothing in this Act shall be construed 
to provide authority for the rule described in subsection (a), nor any 
part thereof, that is not otherwise provided by law.

            Passed the House of Representatives September 28, 2016.

            Attest:

                                                 KAREN L. HAAS,

                                                                 Clerk.
                                                       Calendar No. 662

114th CONGRESS

  2d Session

                               H. R. 6094

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT

 To provide for a 6-month delay in the effective date of a rule of the 
   Department of Labor relating to income thresholds for determining 
   overtime pay for executive, administrative, professional, outside 
                     sales, and computer employees.

_______________________________________________________________________

                           November 15, 2016

            Read the second time and placed on the calendar

Share This