There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protect Family Farms and Businesses Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prevent proposed regulations relating to restrictions on liquidation of an interest with respect to estate, gift, and generation-skipping transfer taxes from taking effect.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/21/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
09/21/2016Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/21/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (92)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 09/21/2016
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 09/21/2016
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/22/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/22/2016
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/22/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/26/2016
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 09/26/2016
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 09/26/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/26/2016
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/26/2016
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/26/2016
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/26/2016
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 09/26/2016
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/26/2016
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 09/27/2016
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/27/2016
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/27/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/27/2016
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 09/27/2016
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 09/27/2016
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 09/27/2016
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/27/2016
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/27/2016
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 09/28/2016
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/28/2016
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/28/2016
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/28/2016
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 09/28/2016
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 09/28/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 09/28/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 09/28/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/28/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/28/2016
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 09/28/2016
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/28/2016
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/28/2016
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/28/2016
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 09/28/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 09/28/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/28/2016
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 09/28/2016
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 11/14/2016
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/14/2016
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 11/14/2016
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/14/2016
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 11/14/2016
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/14/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 11/14/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 11/14/2016
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 11/14/2016
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 11/14/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 11/14/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/14/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 11/14/2016
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/14/2016
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/14/2016
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 11/14/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 11/14/2016
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/14/2016
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 11/14/2016
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/14/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/14/2016
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 11/14/2016
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/14/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 11/14/2016
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/29/2016
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/29/2016
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/29/2016
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 11/29/2016
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 11/29/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/29/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/01/2016
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/16/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/21/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6100. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/21/2016)

Protect Family Farms and Businesses Act

This bill prohibits proposed Internal Revenue Service regulations published on August 4, 2016, relating to restrictions on liquidation of an interest with respect to estate, gift, and generation-skipping transfer taxes from taking effect. The bill prohibits funds from being used to finalize, implement, administer, or enforce the proposed regulations or any substantially similar regulations.