There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Right-to-Work Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To preserve and protect the free choice of individual employees to form, join, or assist labor organizations, or to refrain from such activities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/28/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/29/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
01/28/2015Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/28/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (128)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/28/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/28/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 01/28/2015
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/28/2015
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/28/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/30/2015
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/30/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/30/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/03/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/03/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 02/03/2015
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/03/2015
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/03/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/11/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/11/2015
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 02/11/2015
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/11/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/13/2015
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 02/24/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/24/2015
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/16/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 03/16/2015
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/17/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/26/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 04/13/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 04/16/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/28/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/13/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 06/23/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/25/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 06/25/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/25/2015
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 07/07/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/07/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/10/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/21/2015
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/21/2015
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 09/09/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/12/2016
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/03/2016
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/03/2016
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/29/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/16/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/23/2016
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/11/2016
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/11/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/11/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/23/2016
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/23/2016
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 05/23/2016
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4] 06/08/2016
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 06/22/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 07/07/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 07/07/2016
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/14/2016
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/25/2016
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 09/07/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/14/2016
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/16/2015 03/25/2015 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce01/28/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions04/29/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.612.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.612. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/28/2015)

National Right-to-Work Act

Amends the National Labor Relations Act and the Railway Labor Act to repeal those provisions that permit employers, pursuant to a collective bargaining agreement that is a union security agreement, to require employees to join a union as a condition of employment (including provisions permitting railroad carriers to require, pursuant to such an agreement, payroll deduction of union dues or fees as a condition of employment).