There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

State and Local Sales Tax Deduction Fairness Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

State and Local Sales Tax Deduction Fairness Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent the deduction of State and local general sales taxes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/16/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 272 - 152 (Roll no. 159).(text: CR H2286)
04/06/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-51.
01/30/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
04/20/2015SenateReceived in the Senate.
04/16/2015-11:55amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/16/2015-11:55amHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 272 - 152 (Roll no. 159). (text: CR H2286)
04/16/2015-11:46amHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 179 - 243 (Roll no. 158). (consideration: CR H2289-2290)
04/16/2015-11:15amHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H2289)
04/16/2015-11:08amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, pending a reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to strike section 2 of the bill and replace it with a new section prohibiting an increase in the deficit or a delay or weakening of efforts to adopt a permanent extension of the election to deduct State and local sales taxes so long as such an extension is accomplished in a fiscally responsible manner. The amendment also adds a section to extend the deduction of state and local general sales tax for one year. Subsequently, the point of order was withdrawn.
04/16/2015-11:07amHouseMr. Neal moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Ways and Means. (consideration: CR H2288-2290; text: CR H2288)
04/16/2015-11:05amHouseDEBATE - The House continued with debate on H.R. 622.
04/16/2015-10:45amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 622.
04/16/2015-10:44amHouseThis resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 622, H.R. 1105, and H.R. 1195.
04/16/2015-10:44amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 200. (consideration: CR H2286-2290)
04/06/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 32.
04/06/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-51.
02/12/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14.
02/12/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/10/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/30/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
01/30/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/30/2015
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 01/30/2015
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/02/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/04/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 02/10/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/10/2015
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/11/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/11/2015
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 02/13/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 02/24/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/30/2015 Referred to
02/12/2015 Markup by
04/06/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-51
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/10/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.622. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/16/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on April 6, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

State and Local Sales Tax Deduction Fairness Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) Amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the taxpayer election to deduct state and local general sales taxes in lieu of state and local income taxes.

(Sec. 3) Prohibits the budgetary effects of this Act from being entered on either PAYGO scorecard maintained under the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010.