There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

DHS Social Media Improvement Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Social Media Working Group Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Media Working Group Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

DHS Social Media Improvement Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

DHS Social Media Improvement Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to authorize the Department of Homeland Security to establish a social media working group, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
11/05/2015Became Public Law No: 114-80. (TXT | PDF)
11/05/2015Signed by President.
11/02/2015Presented to President.
10/28/2015Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7314-7315)
10/07/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7223-7224; text as passed Senate: CR S7223-7224)
09/21/2015Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-145.
02/02/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 328 - 51 (Roll no. 53).(text: CR H680-681)
01/30/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/05/2015Became Public Law No: 114-80. (TXT | PDF)
11/05/2015Signed by President.
11/02/2015HousePresented to President.
10/28/2015-5:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/28/2015-5:56pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7314-7315)
10/28/2015-5:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 623.
10/28/2015-5:45pmHouseMr. Costello (PA) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7314-7316)
10/08/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/07/2015SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7223-7224; text as passed Senate: CR S7223-7224)
09/21/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 234.
09/21/2015SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-145.
05/06/2015SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/03/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
02/02/2015-7:16pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/02/2015-7:16pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 328 - 51 (Roll no. 53). (text: CR H680-681)
02/02/2015-7:07pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H685)
02/02/2015-5:54pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/02/2015-5:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 623.
02/02/2015-5:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H680-683)
02/02/2015-5:37pmHouseMrs. Brooks (IN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/02/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/02/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
01/30/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/30/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/30/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/30/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/30/2015
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 01/30/2015
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 02/02/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/02/2015

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/30/2015 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management02/02/2015 Referred to
House Homeland Security01/30/2015 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Communications02/02/2015 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/03/2015 Referred to
05/06/2015 Markup by
09/21/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-145

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.623. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-80 (11/05/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on September 21, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

DHS Social Media Improvement Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Secretary of Homeland Security to establish within the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) a social media working group (the Group) to identify, and provide guidance and best practices to the emergency preparedness and response community on, the use of social media technologies before, during, and after a natural disaster or an act of terrorism or other man-made disaster.

Requires the Group to submit an annual report that includes:

  • a review and analysis of social media technologies used to support preparedness and response activities;
  • a review of best practices and lessons learned;
  • recommendations to improve DHS's use of social media technologies for emergency management purposes, recommendations to improve public awareness of the type of information disseminated through such technologies, and recommendations on how to access such information during a disaster;
  • a review of available training for government officials on the use of social media technologies in response to a disaster; and
  • a review of coordination efforts with the private sector to discuss and resolve legal, operational, technical, privacy, and security concerns.

Terminates the Group five years after the enactment of this Act unless the chairperson renews it for a successive five-year period by submitting a certification that the continued existence of the Group is necessary. Provides for successive five-year renewal periods.