There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Presidential Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend conflict of interest provisions to the President and Vice President of the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/17/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
12/05/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
12/05/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/17/2016Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/17/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/29/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 11/29/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/29/2016
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/29/2016
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/29/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 11/29/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/29/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/29/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/29/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/29/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/29/2016
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/29/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/29/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/29/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 11/29/2016
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/29/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/29/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/29/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/29/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/29/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/29/2016
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 11/29/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/29/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/29/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/29/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 11/29/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 11/29/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/29/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/29/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/29/2016
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 11/29/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/29/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/29/2016
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/29/2016
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/29/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/30/2016
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 11/30/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 11/30/2016
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 11/30/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/30/2016
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 11/30/2016
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/30/2016
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/30/2016
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/30/2016
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/30/2016
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 11/30/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/01/2016
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/01/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/01/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/01/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/01/2016
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/01/2016
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/01/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/01/2016
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/01/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/02/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/02/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/02/2016
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 12/02/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 12/02/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/05/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/05/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/05/2016
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/05/2016
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 12/06/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/06/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/06/2016
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/06/2016
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/06/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/06/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/07/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/07/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/07/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/07/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/07/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/08/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 12/08/2016
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/12/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/12/2016
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/16/2016
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 12/16/2016
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/16/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary11/17/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice12/05/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations12/05/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6340.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6340. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/17/2016)

Presidential Accountability Act

This bill amends the federal criminal code to make it a crime for the President or Vice President to personally and substantially participate in official matters that affect their financial interests, unless the financial interests are held in a blind trust or the President or Vice President discloses the financial interests and receives an exemption.

It imposes criminal penalties—a prison term, a fine, or both—on a President or Vice President who commits the offense. It also authorizes civil penalties and injunctions.

Additionally, a violation constitutes a high crime and misdemeanor (i.e., grounds for impeachment) under Article II, Section 4 of the U.S. Constitution.

Finally, the bill prohibits the President or Vice President from entering into contracts with the U.S. government.