There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

No Religious Registry Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the collection of information and the establishment or utilization of a registry for the purposes of classifying certain United States persons and other individuals on the basis of religious affiliation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/18/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
12/05/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/18/2016Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/18/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (70)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 11/18/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 11/18/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/18/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 11/18/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/18/2016
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 11/18/2016
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/18/2016
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/18/2016
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/25/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/25/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/25/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/25/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 11/25/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/25/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/25/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/25/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/25/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/25/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/25/2016
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/29/2016
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/29/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/29/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/29/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/29/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 11/29/2016
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 11/29/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/30/2016
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/30/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/30/2016
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 11/30/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/30/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/30/2016
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/30/2016
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 12/01/2016
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 12/01/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/01/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/01/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/01/2016
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/01/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/01/2016
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/01/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/01/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/01/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/05/2016
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 12/05/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/05/2016
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/05/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/05/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 12/05/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/07/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/07/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/07/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/07/2016
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/07/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/07/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 12/07/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/07/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/07/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/08/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/08/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/08/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/08/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/12/2016
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/12/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 12/12/2016
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/13/2016
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/13/2016
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/16/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/16/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 12/16/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary11/18/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security12/05/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6382.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6382. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/18/2016)

No Religious Registry Act

This bill prohibits U.S. government officials from collecting information or utilizing a registry or database to classify on the basis of religious affiliation: (1) U.S. nationals or aliens lawfully present in the United States, or (2) aliens who apply for a visa or seek admission to the United States or on whose behalf a petition under the immigration laws is submitted. The bill also prohibits studies related to the collection of such information or the establishment or utilization of such a registry or database.

Nothing in this bill may be construed to prohibit the collection of information that is provided voluntarily, including information relating to the decennial census.