There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Systemic Risk Designation Improvement Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Systemic Risk Designation Improvement Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to specify when bank holding companies may be subject to certain enhanced supervision, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/01/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 254 - 161 (Roll no. 599).(text: CR H7074-7075)
11/22/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
12/05/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/01/2016-6:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/01/2016-6:15pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 254 - 161 (Roll no. 599). (text: CR H7074-7075)
12/01/2016-6:06pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 178 - 236 (Roll no. 598).
12/01/2016-5:58pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7098-7100)
12/01/2016-2:39pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on adopting the motion and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Waters (CA) demanded the yeas and nays, and pursuant to a previous order of the House, the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit with instructions until a time to be announced.
12/01/2016-2:38pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H7086)
12/01/2016-2:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add an exemption to the underlying bill for any bank holding company over $50 billion that has any pending litigation or enforcement matters with an agency of the U.S. government, pending the reservation of a point of order. Subsequently, the point of order was withdrawn.
12/01/2016-2:27pmHouseMs. Waters, Maxine moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (consideration: CR H7084; text: CR H7084)
12/01/2016-2:25pmHouseH.Amdt.1485 On agreeing to the Davidson amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
12/01/2016-2:25pmHouseH.Amdt.1485 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A001) pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H7084)
12/01/2016-2:19pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 934, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Davidson amendment.
12/01/2016-2:19pmHouseH.Amdt.1485 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Davidson. (consideration: CR H7083; text: CR H7083)
12/01/2016-1:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6392.
12/01/2016-1:04pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 34 and H.R. 6392. Providing for consideration for the Senate amendment to H.R. 34 and for consideration of H.R. 6392.
12/01/2016-1:03pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 934. (consideration: CR H7074-7086)
12/01/2016-1:03pmHouseORDER OF PROCEDURE - Mr. Hensarling asked unanimous consent that the question of adopting a motion to recommit on H.R. 6392 be subject to postponement as though under Clause 8 of Rule 20. Agreed to without objection.
11/30/2016-1:34pmHouseRule H. Res. 934 passed House.
11/29/2016-7:28pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 934 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 34 and H.R. 6392. Providing for consideration for the Senate amendment to H.R. 34 and for consideration of H.R. 6392.
11/22/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
11/22/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services11/22/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6392. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/01/2016)

Systemic Risk Designation Improvement Act of 2016

(Sec. 3) This bill amends the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to authorize the Financial Stability Oversight Council (FSOC) to subject a bank holding company to enhanced supervision and prudential standards by the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System if FSOC makes a final determination that material financial distress at the bank holding company, or the nature, scope, size, scale, concentration, interconnectedness, or mix of its activities, could threaten the financial stability of the United States. This FSOC determination procedure replaces the current process under which bank holding companies with total consolidated assets of $50 billion or more are automatically subject to such enhanced supervision and prudential standards.

FSOC must make these final determinations using an indicator-based measurement approach established by the Basel Committee on Banking Supervision to determine systemic importance, which considers each bank holding company's size, interconnectedness, available substitutes, global cross-jurisdictional activity, and complexity.

A bank holding company designated, as of this bill's enactment, as a Global Systemically Important Bank (GSIB) by the Financial Stability Board (FSB) shall be deemed to have been the subject of a final determination that it could pose a threat to U.S. financial stability, thereby making these GSIBs subject to enhanced supervision.

(Sec. 4) The bill revises the Federal Reserve Board's authority over bank holding company acquisition restrictions, prohibitions on interlocks between management of different financial companies, and enhanced supervision and prudential standards to make these requirements subject to FSOC's determination instead of operating automatically when a bank meets a $50 billion threshold.

(Sec. 5) FSOC is prohibited from making a final determination concerning a bank holding company under this bill before one year after its enactment. A bank holding company shall be deemed to have been the subject of such a final determination during this one-year period, however, if its total consolidated assets are $50 billion or more.

(Sec. 6) Bank holding companies with total consolidated assets of $50 billion or more that have not been the subject of a final determination for enhanced supervision and prudential standards remain subject to assessments by the Department of the Treasury for a temporary period to the same extent as a bank holding company that has been subject to a final determination. But the aggregate amount collected from all bank holding companies so assessed is limited to a specified amount to be transferred to: (1) FSOC to distribute to the Federal Reserve Board, the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC), and the general fund of the Treasury for administrative costs resulting from this bill; and (2) the FDIC for resolution costs resulting from this bill. A bank holding company so assessed shall no longer be subject to such assessments in the event it is subject to a final determination.

Assessments collected shall be in addition to, and not as a replacement of, any other assessments required by law.

(Sec. 7) Nothing in this bill may be construed as broadly applying international standards except as specifically provided for FSOC's use of Basel Committee determination factors and the oversight of FSB-designated GSIBs.