Text: H.R.648 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (03/17/2015)


114th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 648


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

March 17, 2015

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions


AN ACT

To amend title XII of the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize certain trauma care programs, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Trauma Systems and Regionalization of Emergency Care Reauthorization Act”.

SEC. 2. Reauthorization of certain trauma care programs.

Section 1232(a) of the Public Health Service Act (42 U.S.C. 300d–32(a)) is amended by striking “2014” and inserting “2020”.

SEC. 3. Improvements and clarifications to certain trauma care programs.

(a) Allocation of funds for competitive grants for regionalized systems for emergency care response.—Section 1232(c) of the Public Health Service Act (42 U.S.C. 300d–31(c)) is amended—

(1) in paragraph (1), by striking “and” at the end;

(2) in paragraph (2), by striking the period at the end and inserting “; and”; and

(3) by adding at the end the following new paragraph:

“(3) for a fiscal year after fiscal year 2015, not more than 50 percent of such amounts remaining for such fiscal year after application of paragraphs (1) and (2) shall be allocated for the purpose of carrying out section 1204.”.

(b) Clarifications under trauma systems formula grants requirements relating to the American Burn Association.—Section 1213 of the Public Health Service Act (42 U.S.C. 300d–13) is amended—

(1) in subsection (a)(3), by inserting “and (for a fiscal year after fiscal year 2015) contains national standards and requirements of the American Burn Association for the designation of verified burn centers,” after “such entity,”;

(2) in subsection (b)(3)(A), by striking “and the American Academy of Pediatrics,” and inserting “the American Academy of Pediatrics, and (for a fiscal year after fiscal year 2015) the American Burn Association,”; and

(3) in subsection (c)(1)—

(A) in the matter preceding subparagraph (A), by inserting “and not later than 1 year after the date of the enactment of the Trauma Systems and Regionalization of Emergency Care Reauthorization Act” after “Act of 2007”; and

(B) in subparagraph (A), by striking “and the American Academy of Pediatrics” and inserting “the American Academy of Pediatrics, and (with respect to the update pursuant to the Trauma Systems and Regionalization of Emergency Care Reauthorization Act) the American Burn Association”.

(c) Conforming amendments.—Part B of title XII of the Public Health Service Act is amended—

(1) in section 1218(c)(2) (42 U.S.C. 300d–18(c)(2)), in the matter preceding subparagraph (A), by striking “1232(b)(3)” and inserting “section 1232(b)”; and

(2) in section 1222 (42 U.S.C. 300d–22), by striking “October 1, 2008” and inserting “October 1, 2017”.

Passed the House of Representatives March 16, 2015.

    Attest: karen l. haas,   
    Clerk

Share This