There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Freedom to Travel to Cuba Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To allow travel between the United States and Cuba.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/02/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/20/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/02/2015Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (131)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/02/2015
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/02/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/02/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/02/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/02/2015
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/03/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/03/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/03/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/03/2015
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/03/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/03/2015
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 02/04/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/24/2015
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/06/2015
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/23/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/23/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/23/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/2015
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 04/23/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/23/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/23/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/23/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/23/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/23/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/23/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/2015
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/23/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/29/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/29/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 06/01/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/02/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/09/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/23/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/15/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/15/2015
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/15/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/15/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/15/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 07/15/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/29/2015
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/15/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/17/2015
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/01/2015
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 10/16/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/28/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/16/2015
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 02/09/2016
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 02/11/2016
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 02/11/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/12/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/12/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/23/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/24/2016
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/24/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 02/24/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/24/2016
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/25/2016
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 02/25/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/01/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/01/2016
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/03/2016
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/03/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/03/2016
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/03/2016
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/03/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/03/2016
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/07/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/07/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/14/2016
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/16/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/16/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 03/16/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/16/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/16/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/16/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 03/16/2016
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/16/2016
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 03/16/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/16/2016
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/16/2016
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/16/2016
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/16/2016
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/16/2016
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 03/16/2016
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/16/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/16/2016
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 03/16/2016
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/16/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/16/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/16/2016
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 03/16/2016
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 03/16/2016
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/17/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/17/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/17/2016
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 03/17/2016
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 03/17/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/17/2016
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/17/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/17/2016
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/17/2016
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/21/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/21/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/21/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/21/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/21/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/21/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/21/2016
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/23/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/11/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/11/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/11/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/11/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/14/2016
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/18/2016
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 04/18/2016
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/18/2016
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/19/2016
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/20/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 04/20/2016
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/21/2016
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/26/2016
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/27/2016
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/12/2016
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 05/18/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/24/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/03/2016
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/07/2016
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/09/2016
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/12/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/02/2015 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere03/20/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.664. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/02/2015)

Freedom to Travel to Cuba Act of 2015

This bill states that:

  • the President may not prohibit or otherwise regulate travel to or from Cuba by U.S. citizens or legal residents, or any of the transactions incident to such travel, including banking transactions;
  • any regulation in effect on the date of enactment of this Act prohibiting or otherwise regulating such travel or transactions incident to such travel shall cease to have any force or effective; but
  • the prohibitions and requirements of this Act shall not apply if the United States is at war with Cuba, armed hostilities between the two countries are in progress, or there is imminent danger to the public health or the physical safety of U.S. travelers.