There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.680. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/03/2015)

Update, Promote, and Develop America's Transportation Essentials Act of 2015

Expresses the sense of Congress that by 2024 the gas tax should be repealed and replaced with a more sustainable, stable funding source.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the excise tax on motor fuels, to increase the rate of tax on: (1) gasoline other than aviation gasoline to 26.3 cents per gallon in 2016, 30.3 cents per gallon in 2017, and 33.3 cents per gallon after 2017 and before 2028; (2) diesel fuel or kerosene to 32.3 cents per gallon in 2016, 36.3 cents per gallon in 2017, and 39.3 cents per gallon after 2017 and before 2027; and (3) diesel-water fuel emulsion. Delays the termination of such increased rates from the end of FY2016 to December 31, 2026. Requires an adjustment for inflation to such increased rates beginning after 2017.

Increases allocations in the Mass Transit Account of the Highway Trust Fund in 2016 and 2017 and after 2017.

Imposes a floor stocks tax on rate increases for gasoline, diesel fuel, and  kerosene (other than aviation-grade kerosene), subject to specified exemptions for exempt uses and low-volume producers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/03/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
02/03/2015 Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2015 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E152-153)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives
01/13/2015 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (H229-230)
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (2)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced:

Update, Promote, and Develop America's Transportation Essentials Act of 2015

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to increase the excise tax on gasoline, diesel, and kerosene fuels.


Subjects (9)

  • Government trust funds
  • Inflation and prices
  • Motor fuels
  • Oil and gas
  • Public transit
  • Roads and highways
  • Sales and excise taxes
  • Transportation programs funding

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/03/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/03/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/03/2015
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/04/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/25/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/23/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/23/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/23/2015
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/11/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/12/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/12/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/12/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/17/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/24/2015
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/07/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/08/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/13/2015
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 09/10/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/03/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.