There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Default Prevention Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Default Prevention Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Default Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure the payment of interest and principal of the debt of the United States.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
10/21/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 235 - 194 (Roll no. 557).(text: CR H7053-7054)
09/18/2015Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-265.
02/03/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/22/2015SenateReceived in the Senate.
10/21/2015-5:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/21/2015-5:52pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 235 - 194 (Roll no. 557). (text: CR H7053-7054)
10/21/2015-5:22pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7077)
10/21/2015-3:49pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 692, the Chair put the question on adoption the bill, and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Levin demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption until later in the legislative day.
10/21/2015-3:49pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H7060)
10/21/2015-2:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 692.
10/21/2015-2:47pmHouseResolution provides for consideration of both H.R. 10 and H.R. 692.
10/21/2015-2:47pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 480. (consideration: CR H7053-7060)
10/21/2015-2:31pmHouseRule H. Res. 480 passed House.
10/20/2015-7:29pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 480 Reported to House. Resolution provides for consideration of both H.R. 10 and H.R. 692.
09/18/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 201.
09/18/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-265.
09/10/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 15.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/10/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/03/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
02/03/2015HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H708)
02/03/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (112)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/03/2015
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 02/03/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 02/03/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 02/03/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/27/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/15/2015
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 04/15/2015
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/15/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 04/15/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 04/29/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 04/29/2015
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/09/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/09/2015
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/10/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/10/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/10/2015
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/10/2015
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/10/2015
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/10/2015
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 06/10/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/10/2015
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/10/2015
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/10/2015
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 06/10/2015
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 06/10/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/10/2015
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/10/2015
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/11/2015
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/11/2015
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/11/2015
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/11/2015
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/17/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/17/2015
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/17/2015
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/17/2015
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/24/2015
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/24/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/24/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 06/24/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/24/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/24/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/24/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/25/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/25/2015
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/25/2015
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/25/2015
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/25/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/25/2015
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/08/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/08/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/08/2015
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/08/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/08/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/08/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/08/2015
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/08/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/08/2015
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/09/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/09/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/09/2015
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/09/2015
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 07/14/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 07/14/2015
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 07/14/2015
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/14/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/15/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/23/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/23/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/10/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/10/2015
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 09/11/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 09/15/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/15/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means02/03/2015 Referred to
09/10/2015 Markup by
09/18/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-265

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.692. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/21/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Default Prevention Act

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of the Treasury to continue to borrow to pay the principal and interest on certain obligations if the debt of the United States exceeds the statutory limit.

If the debt limit is exceeded, Treasury is required to issue obligations solely for the payment of the principal and interest on debt held by the public or the Social Security trust funds. The bill prohibits Treasury from using obligations issued under this bill to compensate Members of Congress.

If Treasury exercises authority provided by this bill, a report must be submitted to Congress including an accounting of: (1) the principal on mature obligations and interest that is due or accrued, and (2) obligations issued under this bill.