There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Cosponsors (137)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/16/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/23/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/13/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 04/20/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/22/2015
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/23/2015
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/28/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 04/28/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/30/2015
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/30/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 05/01/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/01/2015
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/01/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/12/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/20/2015
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/20/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 05/20/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/20/2015
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/20/2015
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/22/2015
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/22/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 05/22/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/22/2015
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/01/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/01/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/01/2015
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/01/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/02/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 06/02/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/02/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/02/2015
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/02/2015
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/03/2015
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 06/03/2015
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/03/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/04/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/04/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 06/04/2015
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/04/2015
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/04/2015
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/04/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 06/04/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 06/08/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/09/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/09/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/09/2015
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/09/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/09/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 06/10/2015
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 06/10/2015
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/11/2015
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/11/2015
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 06/12/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/16/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/16/2015
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/23/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/24/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/07/2015
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 07/07/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/07/2015
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/07/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/07/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/09/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/09/2015
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/09/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/09/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/09/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/09/2015
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/09/2015
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 07/09/2015
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/09/2015
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/09/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 07/09/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/09/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/09/2015
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/09/2015
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/10/2015
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/10/2015
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 07/10/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 07/10/2015
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/10/2015
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/10/2015
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/13/2015
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/13/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/13/2015
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/13/2015
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/13/2015
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 07/14/2015
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/15/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/21/2015
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 07/21/2015
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/21/2015
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/21/2015
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 07/27/2015
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 07/28/2015
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/28/2015
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/28/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 07/29/2015
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/29/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/31/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/08/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/08/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/08/2015
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 09/08/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/08/2015
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 09/08/2015
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 09/08/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/09/2015
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/09/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/09/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/10/2015
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/10/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/10/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/10/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/10/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/11/2015
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/11/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/15/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 09/15/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/16/2015
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/16/2015
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 09/16/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/16/2015
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/17/2015