Committees: H.R.702 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/04/2015 Referred to
09/17/2015 Markup by
10/01/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-267
H. Rept. 114-267
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power02/06/2015 Referred to
07/09/2015 Hearings by
09/10/2015 Markup by
09/10/2015 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs02/04/2015 Referred to
09/25/2015 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade03/11/2015 Referred to
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs10/19/2015 Referred to