There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.711. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/2015)

Equal Treatment of Public Servants Act of 2015

Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act to replace the current windfall elimination provision (WEP) (that reduces the Social Security benefits of workers who also have pension benefits from employment not covered by Social Security) for individuals who: (1) become eligible for old-age insurance benefits after 2016 or would attain age 62 after 2016 and become eligible for disability insurance benefits after 2016, (2) subsequently become entitled to such benefits, and (3) have earnings derived from noncovered service performed after 1977.

Establishes a new formula for the treatment of noncovered earnings in determining Social Security benefits.

Prescribes a second formula to modify the WEP for current beneficiaries.

Directs the Commissioner of Social Security to recover overpayments from certain individuals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/04/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/27/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: House Ways and Means
02/04/2015 Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (2)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced:

Equal Treatment of Public Servants Act of 2015

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to repeal the windfall elimination provision and protect the retirement of public servants.


Subjects (6)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Government information and archives
  • Social Security Administration
  • Social security and elderly assistance

Cosponsors (131)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/10/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/13/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 02/13/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/13/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/24/2015
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/24/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/24/2015
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/24/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/24/2015
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/18/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/18/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/18/2015
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/19/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/26/2015
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/23/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/23/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/23/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/01/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/01/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/05/2015
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/12/2015
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/12/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 05/13/2015
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 06/02/2015
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/02/2015
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/11/2015
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/25/2015
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 07/20/2015
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 07/20/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/20/2015
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/20/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/20/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/20/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/29/2015
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/29/2015
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/29/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/29/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/11/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 09/16/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/28/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 10/07/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/09/2015
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/02/2015
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 11/02/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/02/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/17/2015
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 11/17/2015
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 12/18/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/18/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/18/2015
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/02/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/02/2016
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 02/02/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 02/02/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/02/2016
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/11/2016
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/11/2016
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 02/11/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 02/23/2016
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/15/2016
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/15/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/15/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/15/2016
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/11/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/11/2016
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/12/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/12/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/14/2016
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/14/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/14/2016
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/15/2016
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/15/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/19/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/19/2016
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/19/2016
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/19/2016
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/19/2016
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/26/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/27/2016
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/28/2016
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/28/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/28/2016
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/06/2016
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/06/2016
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/10/2016
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/12/2016
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/12/2016
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/13/2016
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/16/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/17/2016
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/17/2016
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/23/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/23/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/24/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 05/24/2016
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/24/2016
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 05/24/2016
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 05/25/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/25/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/07/2016
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/08/2016
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/09/2016
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/09/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/14/2016
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/16/2016
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/16/2016
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 06/16/2016
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/21/2016
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/22/2016
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/01/2016
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 07/05/2016
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 07/05/2016
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/05/2016
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/07/2016
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/07/2016
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/07/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/11/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/11/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/14/2016
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/18/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/21/2016
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 09/06/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 09/06/2016
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/06/2016
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/06/2016
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/06/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/06/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/26/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/28/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/15/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/04/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security02/27/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.711.