There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Gerardo Hernandez Airport Security Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Gerardo Hernandez Airport Security Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Gerardo Hernandez Airport Security Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Gerardo Hernandez Airport Security Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Gerardo Hernandez Airport Security Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve intergovernmental planning for and communication during security incidents at domestic airports, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
09/24/2015Became Public Law No: 114-50. (TXT | PDF)
09/24/2015Signed by President.
09/17/2015Presented to President.
09/16/2015Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5990-5991)
08/05/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6422-6423; text as passed Senate: CR S6422-6423)
07/23/2015Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-92.
02/10/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 1 (Roll no. 70).(text: CR H894-895)
02/04/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/24/2015Became Public Law No: 114-50. (TXT | PDF)
09/24/2015Signed by President.
09/17/2015HousePresented to President.
09/16/2015-3:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/16/2015-3:26pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5990-5991)
09/16/2015-3:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 720.
09/16/2015-3:12pmHouseMr. Katko moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H5990-5993)
08/06/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/05/2015SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6422-6423; text as passed Senate: CR S6422-6423)
07/23/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 163.
07/23/2015SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-92.
02/26/2015SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/12/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
02/11/2015SenateReceived in the Senate.
02/10/2015-7:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/10/2015-7:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 1 (Roll no. 70). (text: CR H894-895)
02/10/2015-7:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H898-899)
02/10/2015-5:32pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/10/2015-5:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 720.
02/10/2015-5:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H894-897)
02/10/2015-5:18pmHouseMr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/09/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
02/04/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
02/04/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security02/04/2015 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Transportation Security02/09/2015 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation02/12/2015 Referred to
02/26/2015 Markup by
07/23/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-92

No related bill information was received for H.R.720.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.720. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-50 (09/24/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on August 5, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Gerardo Hernandez Airport Security Act of 2015

(Sec. 3) Directs the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) of the Department of Homeland Security to: (1) conduct outreach to all U.S. airports at which the TSA performs, or oversees the implementation and performance of, security measures; and (2) give necessary technical assistance to verify that such airports have in place individualized working plans for responding to security incidents inside the airport perimeter, including active shooters, acts of terrorism, and incidents that target passenger-screening checkpoints.

Requires the TSA to report to Congress on the outreach findings, including an analysis of the level of preparedness such airports have to respond to such incidents.

(Sec. 4) Requires the TSA to: (1) identify best practices that exist across airports for security incident planning, management, and training; and (2) establish a mechanism through which to share those best practices with other airport operators nationwide.

(Sec. 5) Requires the TSA also to: (1) certify annually to specified congressional committees that all screening personnel have participated in practical training exercises for active shooter scenarios, and (2) analyze for those same committees how TSA can use cost savings achieved through efficiencies to increase over the next five fiscal years the funding available for checkpoint screening law enforcement support reimbursable agreements.

(Sec. 7) Directs the TSA to: (1) conduct outreach to all passenger transportation agencies and providers with high-risk facilities to verify that they have in place plans for responding to active shooters, acts of terrorism, or other security-related incidents that target passengers; and (2) identify best practices for security incident planning, management, and training and establish a mechanism through which to share such practices with passenger transportation agencies nationwide.

(Sec. 8) Declares that no additional appropriations are authorized to carry out this Act. Requires this Act to be carried out using amounts otherwise available.

(Sec. 9) Requires the TSA to review the interoperable communications capabilities of law enforcement, fire, and medical personnel responsible for responding to security incidents at all U.S. airports at which the TSA performs, or oversees the implementation and performance of, security measures.