There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.727. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/2015)

Puerto Rico Statehood Admission Process Act

Authorizes the State Elections Commission of Puerto Rico to provide for a vote on Puerto Rico's admission into the Union as a state within one year of this Act's enactment.

Requires the governor of Puerto Rico to transmit the results of such vote to the President, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, and the President Pro Tempore of the Senate within 10 days after the certification of the vote by the Commission.

Directs the President, if a majority of the votes cast are for Puerto Rico's admission as a state: (1) within 30 calendar days of receipt of the certified results, to issue a proclamation to begin the transition process that will culminate in Puerto Rico's admission as a state effective January 1, 2021; and (2) within 90 calendar days of such receipt, to appoint a Commission on the Equal Application of Federal Law to Puerto Rico, which shall survey U.S. laws and submit recommendations to Congress by July 1, 2018, as to how laws that do not apply, or that apply differently, to the territory should be amended or repealed to treat Puerto Rico equally.

Requires Puerto Rico to carry out necessary actions by January 1, 2020, to enable it to hold elections for federal office in November 2020, including the election to the 117th Congress of two U.S. Senators and the number of Representatives to which it would have been entitled for the 116th Congress if it had been a state during such Congress. Provides for a temporary increase in the membership of the House of Representatives initially and a permanent increase effective with the taking effect of the first reapportionment occurring after the regular decennial census conducted for 2020.

Requires the President, following a transition process, to issue a proclamation declaring that Puerto Rico is admitted to the Union on an equal footing with the other states, effective January 1, 2021.

Sets forth provisions regarding the continuity of government and the continuity of laws of Puerto Rico.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/04/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/16/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Indians, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: House Natural Resources
02/04/2015 Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2015 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H760)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (2)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced:

Puerto Rico Statehood Admission Process Act

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To set forth the process for Puerto Rico to be admitted as a State of the Union.


Subjects (9)

  • Caribbean area
  • Congressional elections
  • Congressional operations and organization
  • Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
  • House of Representatives
  • Puerto Rico
  • State and local government operations
  • U.S. territories and protectorates

Cosponsors (110)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/04/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/04/2015
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/12/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/12/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/12/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/12/2015
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/12/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/12/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/12/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/12/2015
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/12/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 02/12/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/12/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/25/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 02/25/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/25/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/04/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/04/2015
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/04/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/04/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/04/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/18/2015
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/18/2015
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/18/2015
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/18/2015
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/18/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/18/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/18/2015
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/18/2015
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/18/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/18/2015
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/19/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/25/2015
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 03/25/2015
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/25/2015
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 03/25/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/25/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/25/2015
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/25/2015
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/26/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/26/2015
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/22/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/22/2015
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/22/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/22/2015
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/22/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/22/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/22/2015
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/22/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/22/2015
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/22/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/22/2015
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/22/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/29/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/30/2015
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/21/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/21/2015
Rep. Graham, Gwen [D-FL-2] 06/16/2015
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/18/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/25/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/29/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/04/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs03/16/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.