There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to provide for the dissemination of information regarding available Federal programs relating to energy efficiency projects for schools, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/06/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7190-7191)
02/05/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
12/07/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/06/2016-12:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/06/2016-12:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7190-7191)
12/06/2016-12:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 756.
12/06/2016-12:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7190-7192)
12/06/2016-12:22pmHouseMr. Olson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/06/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/05/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/05/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/11/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/11/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/11/2015
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/11/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/11/2015
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/12/2015
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/20/2015
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 02/25/2015
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/03/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 03/03/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 03/16/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/22/2015
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/18/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/23/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/25/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/06/2016
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 05/10/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/10/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/16/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/16/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/08/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/08/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/08/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/05/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power02/06/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.756. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (12/06/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to direct the Department of Energy's Office of Energy and Renewable Energy to establish a clearinghouse to disseminate information regarding available programs and financing mechanisms that may be used to help initiate, develop, and finance energy efficiency, distributed generation, and energy retrofitting projects for schools.

The office must: (1) consult with appropriate agencies to develop a list of programs and financing mechanisms that are, or may be, used for the projects; and (2) coordinate with appropriate agencies to develop a collaborative education and outreach effort to streamline communications and promote the programs and financing mechanisms.