There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fair BEER Act
Fair Brewers Excise and Economic Relief Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to reform and reset the excise tax on beer, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/05/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/05/2015Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/05/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (118)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 02/05/2015
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/10/2015
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/10/2015
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/11/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/11/2015
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/20/2015
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 02/20/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/20/2015
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/20/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/20/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/24/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 02/25/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/27/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/03/2015
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/04/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/16/2015
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/16/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/17/2015
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/23/2015
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/23/2015
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/23/2015
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/24/2015
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/24/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/25/2015
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/25/2015
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/26/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 03/26/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 03/26/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/26/2015
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 04/14/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/14/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/14/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 04/16/2015
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/16/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/21/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/21/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/21/2015
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/21/2015
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/21/2015
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/21/2015
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/21/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 04/28/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/28/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/29/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/29/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/29/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/30/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/30/2015
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/08/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/08/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/08/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 05/08/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/14/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/14/2015
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 05/14/2015
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/14/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/14/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/18/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/18/2015
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/18/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/19/2015
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/19/2015
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/20/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/2015
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 06/01/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/01/2015
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/01/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/03/2015
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 06/03/2015
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/03/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/03/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/03/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/04/2015
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/04/2015
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/04/2015
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/09/2015
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/09/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/09/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/09/2015
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/09/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/10/2015
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/10/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/12/2015
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 06/12/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 06/12/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/17/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/17/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/17/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/23/2015
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/23/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/25/2015
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/25/2015
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/08/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/22/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/09/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 09/17/2015
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/25/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/05/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.767. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/05/2015)

Fair Brewers Excise and Economic Relief Act or the Fair BEER Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to revise the excise tax on beer brewed or produced, and removed for consumption or sale, within the United States or imported into the United States. The revised tax ranges from $0 for an amount not exceeding 7,143 barrels to $18 per barrel on an amount exceeding 2 million barrels.