There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Ensuring Seniors Access to Local Pharmacies Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to ensure equal access of Medicare beneficiaries to community pharmacies in underserved areas as network pharmacies under Medicare prescription drug coverage, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/05/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
02/27/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/06/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/05/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/05/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/05/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/05/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (101)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/05/2015
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/11/2015
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 02/11/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/11/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/11/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/11/2015
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/11/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 02/13/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/24/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/24/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 02/24/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/02/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/02/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/02/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 03/04/2015
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/16/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/16/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/16/2015
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/16/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/23/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/23/2015
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/23/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/13/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/13/2015
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/13/2015
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/13/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 04/13/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 04/13/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 04/15/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/15/2015
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/16/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/28/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/28/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/29/2015
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/29/2015
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/30/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/30/2015
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/01/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/13/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/14/2015
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/14/2015
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/14/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 05/15/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 05/15/2015
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/18/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 05/18/2015
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/19/2015
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/21/2015
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/21/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/21/2015
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/01/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/01/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 07/07/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 07/13/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/13/2015
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/28/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/11/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/17/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/08/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 10/09/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/02/2015
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/02/2015
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 11/02/2015
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/05/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/05/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/16/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/16/2015
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/16/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/18/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/18/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/08/2015
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 12/08/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/16/2015
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/17/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/08/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/01/2016
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/01/2016
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/01/2016
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/04/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 02/12/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/02/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 03/14/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/21/2016
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/21/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/21/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/22/2016
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/23/2016
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/12/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/12/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/15/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/18/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/26/2016
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/26/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/17/2016
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/09/2016
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/13/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 09/08/2016
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/12/2016
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/16/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/05/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/06/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/05/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/27/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.793. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/05/2015)

Ensuring Seniors Access to Local Pharmacies Act of 2015

Amends part D (Voluntary Prescription Drug Benefit Program) of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to direct any prescription drug plan that has in its network one or more pharmacies located in a health professional shortage area, in a medically underserved area, or among a medically underserved population, and that provides a reduction in coinsurance or copayments for covered part D drugs, to extend to any pharmacy located in that area, or among that population, the option to be an in-network pharmacy under terms and conditions comparable to those the plan has agreed upon with other in-network pharmacies located in the area or among that population.