There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (8)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DOTCOM Act of 2015
Domain Openness Through Continued Oversight Matters Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

DOTCOM Act of 2015
Domain Openness Through Continued Oversight Matters Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

DOTCOM Act of 2015
Domain Openness Through Continued Oversight Matters Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To provide for certain requirements relating to the Internet Assigned Numbers Authority stewardship transition.

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the National Telecommunications and Information Administration from relinquishing responsibility over the Internet domain name system until the Comptroller General of the United States submits to Congress a report on the role of the NTIA with respect to such system.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/23/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 25 (Roll no. 377).(text: CR H4550)
06/23/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-175.
02/05/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
07/14/2016SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
06/24/2015SenateReceived in the Senate.
06/23/2015-7:10pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/23/2015-7:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/23/2015-7:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 25 (Roll no. 377). (text: CR H4550)
06/23/2015-7:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4581)
06/23/2015-3:09pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/23/2015-3:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 805.
06/23/2015-3:02pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4550-4551)
06/23/2015-3:02pmHouseMr. Shimkus moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/23/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 130.
06/23/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-175.
06/17/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/17/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/16/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/10/2015HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
06/10/2015HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
02/06/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/05/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/05/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/05/2015 Referred to
06/17/2015 Markup by
06/23/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-175
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology02/06/2015 Referred to
06/10/2015 Markup by
06/10/2015 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/14/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.805. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/23/2015)

Domain Openness Through Continued Oversight Matters Act of 2015 or the DOTCOM Act of 2015

Prohibits the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information from permitting the National Telecommunications and Information Administration's (NTIA's) role in the performance of the Internet Assigned Numbers Authority (IANA) functions to cease until 30 legislative days after the Assistant Secretary submits to Congress a report that contains: (1) the proposal relating to the transition of the NTIA's stewardship of the IANA functions that was developed in a process convened by the Internet Corporation for Assigned Names and Numbers (ICANN) at the request of the NTIA, and (2) the following required certifications by the Assistant Secretary.

Requires the Assistant Secretary to certify that: (1) such proposal supports and enhances the multistakeholder model of Internet governance, maintains the security, stability, and resiliency of the Internet domain name system, meets the needs of global customers and partners of the IANA services, maintains the openness of the Internet, and does not replace the role of the NTIA with a government-led or intergovernmental organization solution; and (2) the required changes to ICANN's bylaws contained in the final report of ICANN's Cross Community Working Group on Enhancing ICANN Accountability and the changes to ICANN's bylaws required by ICANN's IANA Stewardship Transition Coordination Group have been adopted.