Summary: H.R.817 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for H.R.817. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/09/2015)

Fairness in Ambulance Reimbursement Act of 2015

This bill directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services to suspend through December 31, 2015, implementation of the reclassification of rural to urban zip codes for payments under the fee schedule for ambulance services, as contained in the final rule published in the Federal Register by the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services on November 13, 2014.

The Secretary is required to ensure that claims for ambulance services furnished on or after July 1, 2015, are paid according to the classification of zip codes applied the day before the effective date of that final rule.

The Secretary must reclassify rural to urban zip codes for payment for ambulance services furnished on or after January 1, 2016, taking into account specified revised geographic delineations of the Office of Management and Budget.

Payments for ambulance services (other than air ambulance services) furnished during 2016 must be adjusted according to a certain formula to achieve budget-neutral results.